A photograph of a painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848.
A portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867. In the bottom margin is the caption, "SAMUEL B. WOOLWORTH, Principal 1852-1856."
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867; Joseph Alden, President of the (New York) State Normal School from April 3, 1867-May 23, 1882; Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889; and William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889-September 4, 1914. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990 with a group of unidentified people dining. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. O'Leary is the gentleman between the two women on the right side of the table. There are crop marks and in the top margin is written between arrows "55% 14 picas" and an uppercase letter "B" enclosed in a circle.
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B. (viewer's right), Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947 and Milton G. Nelson, Ph.D. (viewer's left), Acting President, New York State College for Teachers from March 1947-July 1949. They are greeting students at a President's Reception.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the bottom margin is the caption, "JOHN M. SAYLES, President 1939-1947."
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. The photograph appears to be encased in matting and in the top margin of the mat are the handwritten words, "Presidents - Milne," and the library stamp ("LIBRARY STATE COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS ALBANY, N.Y.") has been used in the lower part of the image. A photographer's stamp for Sterry of Albany, N.Y. is in the lower margin of the mat.
A portrait of Buell G. Gallagher, a visiting speaker to the campus. He was the President of the City University of New York, City College from 1952 until May 1969. At one time he served as the Assistant Commissioner for Higher Education in the U.S. Office of Education.