A picture of H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, speaking at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration, held in Page Hall, April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is seated in the background.
New York State Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the State University of New York at Albany's School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration held in Page Hall on April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is sitting in the background. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at a press conference at which local television channels WRGB (6) and WTEN (10) are present. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at a press conference at which local television channels WRGB (6) and WTEN (10) are present. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of mostly unidentified people sitting at the head table associated with a University at Albany, SUNY Alumni Association event at which a woman is giving a speech. Known people in the photograph are Carol Livingston, Harold C. Hanson, Esq., Class of 1963, and Vincent O'Leary who is the gentleman seated second from the viewer's right and is leaning forward. O'Leary was Acting President of the university from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, discussing the University's proposal at a press conference. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, listening to a speech being delivered by an unidentified gentleman. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "3-A 62.5%;" in the right bottom margin is written "reduce to 29 picas" (between arrows); and in the left margin is written "reduce to 23 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech in one of the buildings of the Uptown Campus. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the left margin is written "PHOTO H;" in the bottom margin is written "reduce to 14 picas" (between arrows); and in the right margin is written "reduce to 19 picas" (between arrows).