The presentation of the Agnes E. Futterer portrait painting given by the Theatre Alumni Association. Pictured are (left to right) J. Ruben Garcia, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1955 and President of the Theatre Alumni Association at the time of the event, Agnes Futterer, Class of 1916, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of the event) from July 1949 - June 30, 1969. Futterer was also a long-time faculty member in the Department of Theatre. The event is taking place in association with Alumni Day, 1966.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 2110 and 4888.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4916, 4888.
A portrait proof of Abram (Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4888, 4916, and 2110. At the top of the photograph is written, "To 6 1/2" with cropping marks and on the right side is written, "To 8" with cropping marks.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939. At the bottom of the photo are the words, "ABRAM R. BRUBACHER, President (first line) 1915-1939" (second line); duplicate of 2110 and 4916.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867; Joseph Alden, President of the (New York) State Normal School from April 3, 1867-May 23, 1882; Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889; and William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889-September 4, 1914. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the bottom margin is the caption, "JOHN M. SAYLES, President 1939-1947."