A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking at his presidential inauguration.
Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, making a speech at his Presidential Inaugration. On the proof, "ENLAR. TO 4 IN." is written on the viewer's righthand side along with cropping marks.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, giving his first address to the university's faculty in one of the buildings of the Uptown Campus.
Janice Friedman Keller, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1940, speaking at the presentation ceremony of Project Carillon, a fund raising initiative. The event is associated with the State University of New York at Albany, Alumni Day, 1966 and is taking place on the uptown campus. Seated to the right of the podium are Dr. Kenneth T. Doran, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1939, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Janice Friedman Keller, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1940, speaking at the presentation ceremony of Project Carillon, a fund raising initiative. The event is associated with the State University of New York at Albany, Alumni Day, 1966 and is taking place on the uptown campus. Seated to the right of the podium are Dr. Kenneth T. Doran, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1939, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Janice Friedman Keller, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1940, speaking at the presentation ceremony of Project Carillon, a fund raising initiative. The event is associated with the State University of New York at Albany, Alumni Day, 1966 and is taking place on the uptown campus. Seated to the right of the podium are Dr. Kenneth T. Doran, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1939, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, speaking at the 1971 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary (second from viewer's left), Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, delivering a speech at the 1982 State University of New York at Albany commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on two sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "PHOTO 3A" and "14 picas" (between arrows). In the left margin is written "14 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, speaking at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration, held in Page Hall, April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is seated in the background.
New York State Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the State University of New York at Albany's School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration held in Page Hall on April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is sitting in the background. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, attending a Community Breakfast event. Fields is the gentleman seated and the gentleman speaking is unidentified.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at the March 1979 Center for Women in Government Conference at SUNY Albany. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1, 1975?1977, making a speech; from the Tower Tribune newspaper.
Vincent O'Leary, President of the State University of New York at Albany at the time the photo was taken, at a press conference about the Civic Center. He is presenting the University's proposal for the construction of the Albany County Civic Center to members of the Albany County Legislature. Vincent O'Leary was the Acting President of the State University of New York at Albany from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990.
Vincent O'Leary, President of the State University of New York at Albany at the time the photo was taken, at a press conference about the Civic Center. He is presenting the University's proposal for the construction of a Civic Center on campus to members of the Albany County Legislature. Vincent O'Leary was the Acting President of the State University of New York at Albany from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking on budgetary matters at a special meeting of the University Senate. The image appeared in the Tower Tribune student newspaper on February 2, 1976.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at a press conference at which local television channels WRGB (6) and WTEN (10) are present. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at a press conference at which local television channels WRGB (6) and WTEN (10) are present. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of mostly unidentified people sitting at the head table associated with a University at Albany, SUNY Alumni Association event at which a woman is giving a speech. Known people in the photograph are Carol Livingston, Harold C. Hanson, Esq., Class of 1963, and Vincent O'Leary who is the gentleman seated second from the viewer's right and is leaning forward. O'Leary was Acting President of the university from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990.
Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking at the Alumni Luncheon during Alumni Weekend, 1977.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, discussing the University's proposal at a press conference. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, listening to a speech being delivered by an unidentified gentleman. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "3-A 62.5%;" in the right bottom margin is written "reduce to 29 picas" (between arrows); and in the left margin is written "reduce to 23 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech in one of the buildings of the Uptown Campus. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the left margin is written "PHOTO H;" in the bottom margin is written "reduce to 14 picas" (between arrows); and in the right margin is written "reduce to 19 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech at a commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990 at an unidentified banquet-like event, either preparing to give a speech or just finishing one. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There is an unidentified woman in the foreground.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, speaking at a memorial service for the 11 Israeli athletes killed at the 1972 Olympic Games in Munich, West Germany. The photograph was used in the 1973 "Torch," the school's yearbook.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, speaking at a memorial service for the 11 Israeli athletes killed in the 1972 Olympic Games in Munich, Germany. The photograph was used in the 1973 "Torch," the school's yearbook.
Images taken on the occasion of Louis T. Benezet's inauguration as President of the State University of New York at Albany (President from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975). This contact sheet holds many images of people in conversation.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, reading a statement before a group of students at one of his Student Information Hours.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, speaking or preparing to speak at an event.
A picture of Charles W. Bowler, State University of New York at Albany, Class of 1969 as he addresses people gathered at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1967. The gentleman in the foreground, somewhat in profile, is Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the school at the time of this event) from July 1949 - June 30, 1969.
A picture of Charles W. Bowler, State University of New York at Albany, Class of 1969 as he addresses people gathered at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1967. The gentleman in the foreground, somewhat in profile, is Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the school at the time of this event) from July 1949 - June 30, 1969.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, making a speech.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 speaking at Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 delivering a speech during the commencement ceremony, 1964.