Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, and his wife, Mildred Benezet, are admiring a retirement gift, a René Lalique crystal centerpiece, presented by Eunice Baird Whittlesey, Alumni Association President, at Alumni Weekend, May 9-11, 1975.
Mildred Benezet holding the gift her husband, Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, received from Eunice Baird Whittlesey (at right), Alumni Association President, at Alumni Weekend, May 9-11, 1975. The gift, a René Lalique crystal centerpiece, was given in honor of Benezet's retirement.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary (second from viewer's left), Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, delivering a speech at the 1982 State University of New York at Albany commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on two sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "PHOTO 3A" and "14 picas" (between arrows). In the left margin is written "14 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of Vincent O'Leary (second from viewer's left), Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, at the 1982 State University of New York at Albany commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975 and his wife, Mildred, receive a gift from Eunice Baird Whittlesey, the Alumni Association President, at Alumni Weekend, May 9-11, 1975.
A picture of H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, speaking at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991. Swygert is the gentleman in the center.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, State University of New York at Albany Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, shaking hands with students playing the game musical chairs for Guinness Day, April 20, 1985. They are attempting to get into the Guinness Book of World Records for the largest game of musical chairs. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "16A" and "reduce to 28 3/4_'s;" in the bottom margin is written "REDUCE TO 19_'S" (between arrows); and in the left margin is written "REDUCE TO illegible" (between arrows).
Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration, held in Page Hall, April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is seated in the background.