A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking at his presidential inauguration.
Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, making a speech at his Presidential Inaugration. On the proof, "ENLAR. TO 4 IN." is written on the viewer's righthand side along with cropping marks.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, giving his first address to the university's faculty in one of the buildings of the Uptown Campus.
Allan A. Kuusisto, acting President of the State University of New York at Albany, July 1, 1969 to June 30, 1970, giving a speech at the 1970 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony.
Janice Friedman Keller, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1940, speaking at the presentation ceremony of Project Carillon, a fund raising initiative. The event is associated with the State University of New York at Albany, Alumni Day, 1966 and is taking place on the uptown campus. Seated to the right of the podium are Dr. Kenneth T. Doran, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1939, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Janice Friedman Keller, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1940, speaking at the presentation ceremony of Project Carillon, a fund raising initiative. The event is associated with the State University of New York at Albany, Alumni Day, 1966 and is taking place on the uptown campus. Seated to the right of the podium are Dr. Kenneth T. Doran, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1939, and Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
A picture of an Alumni Luncheon held in association with the State University of New York at Albany Alumni Day, June 18, 1966. The event is taking place at Dutch Quad on the uptown campus with Evan R. Collins addressing the crowd. Collins was President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, speaking at the 1966 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. This was the first commencement to take place on the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, and unidentified people participating in an event associated with the 1966 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. This was the first commencement to take place on the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, speaking during the 1966 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. This was the first commencement ceremony held on the uptown campus.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary (second from viewer's left), Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, delivering a speech at the 1982 State University of New York at Albany commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on two sides of the photograph. In the top margin is written "PHOTO 3A" and "14 picas" (between arrows). In the left margin is written "14 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 ? July 31, 1995, speaking at his inauguration ceremony, held April 5, 1991.
Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration, held in Page Hall, April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is seated in the background.
New York State Senator Daniel Patrick Moynihan as the keynote speaker at the State University of New York at Albany's School of Social Welfare's 25th Anniversary Celebration held in Page Hall on April 11, 1991. Moynihan served in the U.S. Senate from New York as a Democrat from 1977-2001. H. Patrick Swygert, J.D., President of the University at Albany, SUNY from August 1, 1990 - July 31, 1995 is sitting in the background. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at an event related to an agreement between the State University of New York at Albany and New York University, April 1984. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, at an event related to an agreement between the State University of New York at Albany and New York University, April 1984. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, attending a Community Breakfast event. Fields is the gentleman seated and the gentleman speaking is unidentified.
Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at the March 1979 Center for Women in Government Conference at SUNY Albany. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking on budgetary matters at a special meeting of the University Senate. The image appeared in the Tower Tribune student newspaper on February 2, 1976.
A picture of mostly unidentified people sitting at the head table associated with a University at Albany, SUNY Alumni Association event at which a woman is giving a speech. Known people in the photograph are Carol Livingston, Harold C. Hanson, Esq., Class of 1963, and Vincent O'Leary who is the gentleman seated second from the viewer's right and is leaning forward. O'Leary was Acting President of the university from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990.
A portrait of John Brademas, president of New York University from 1981 to 1991, speaker at the 1983 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. There are crop marks in the top and left margins of the original.
Emmett B. Fields, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1975?1977, speaking at the Alumni Luncheon during Alumni Weekend, 1977.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech in one of the buildings of the Uptown Campus. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph. In the left margin is written "PHOTO H;" in the bottom margin is written "reduce to 14 picas" (between arrows); and in the right margin is written "reduce to 19 picas" (between arrows).
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, giving a speech at a commencement. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, speaking at a commencement ceremony. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing.
A portrait of John C. Sawhill, president of New York University from 1975 to 1980, speaker at the 1976 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony.
U.S. Senator Jacob Javits speaking at the 1967 State University of New York commencement ceremony with R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969 and his administration sitting on either side.
A picture of Charles W. Bowler, State University of New York at Albany, Class of 1969 as he addresses people gathered at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1967. The gentleman in the foreground, somewhat in profile, is Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the school at the time of this event) from July 1949 - June 30, 1969.
A picture of Charles W. Bowler, State University of New York at Albany, Class of 1969 as he addresses people gathered at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1967. The gentleman in the foreground, somewhat in profile, is Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the school at the time of this event) from July 1949 - June 30, 1969.
At an event associated with commencement, an unidentified speaker announcing Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949 until June 30, 1969. Collins' back is to the camera.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 speaking at Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 delivering a speech during the commencement ceremony, 1964.
Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting faculty on during the 1965 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. Duplicate of 1341.