Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, and New York Mayor Erastus Corning participating in an event during Community-University Day 1973.
A picture of Grenfell N. Rand, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1934, Augusta Katz Biskin, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1936, dressed as Minerva, and Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, at an event during Alumni Day, 1972. The event is taking place in a building on the uptown campus.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, speaking at a memorial service for the 11 Israeli athletes killed at the 1972 Olympic Games in Munich, West Germany. The photograph was used in the 1973 "Torch," the school's yearbook.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, speaking at a memorial service for the 11 Israeli athletes killed in the 1972 Olympic Games in Munich, Germany. The photograph was used in the 1973 "Torch," the school's yearbook.
Louis T. Benezet, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975, at a party, apparently receiving a toast. He is in the lower righthand corner of the photograph, wearing a white coat.
Clifton C. Thorne, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1949 and former Vice President of Student Affairs of the State University of New York at Albany and his family with Louis Benezet. Louis T. Benezet was the President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975.
Introductory Coffee Hour with President Louis T. Benezet. Benezet (President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1, 1970-June 30, 1975) is pictured with Charles T. O'Reilly, who was acting Academic Vice President from 1969-1971 (viewer's left) and Allan A. Kuusisto (viewer's right), who was acting President of the State University of New York at Albany, July 1, 1969-June 30, 1970.