A picture of Louis J. Wolner, Jr., State University of New York College of Education at Albany, Class of 1961 and 1962, standing next to a portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the New York State Normal School from September 20, 1852 until February 1, 1856.
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE 1856-1864."
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) David Perkins Page, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848; George R. Perkins, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852; Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867; and David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service. Perkins' image is rendered in a sculpted bust in the classical tradition.
A picture of a page from the Daily Graphic, January 27, 1885, pg.630. A collage of sketches, one depicts President-elect Cleveland at the closing exercises of the New York State Normal School, and another is a sketch of Edward P. Waterbury, President of New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882 to August 8, 1889. Sketches by R.Sheridan. Original is in flat file.(3 Copies: 1 in Sesquicentennial Binder and 2 in Photofile)
William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the bottom margin are the words, "WILLIAM J. MILNE, President (first line) 1889-1915" (second line). There are crop marks on all sides and a note of "C 41%" written at the bottom.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the bottom margin is the caption, "WILLIAM J. MILNE, President 1889-1915."
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph, some illegible writing in the top margin, and in the bottom margin is noted, "1-1 5A pg 5 58423."
A portrait of David Perkins Page, Principal of the New York State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848. In the top margin are the words, "served as institute conductors, and as teachers in academies and city schools. The intent of the legislature in establishing this first normal school seems to have" and in the bottom margin, "DAVID P. PAGE FIRST PRINCIPAL OF THE NORMAL SCHOOL AT ALBANY." The incomplete sentence may be part of running text to and from other pages.
A photograph of a portrait bust of George R. Perkins, Principal of the New York State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852. In the bottom margin is the caption, "GEORGE R. PERKINS." In handwritten notes are ".50 D pg 4-5."
A photograph of a portrait bust of George R. Perkins, Principal of the New York State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852. In the bottom margin is the caption, "GEORGE R. PERKINS, Principal January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852."
A contact sheet of images of roughly the same content that being Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, with an unidentified gentleman. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. Photograph 12431 is one of the images in this contact sheet.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. The Albany Art Union photographer's stamp is located in the bottom margin of the photograph.
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. The caption "EDWARD P. WATERBURY 1882-1889" is noted in the bottom margin of the photograph as are the handwritten notations ".55 pg 4" and an upper case "I" inclosed in a circle. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867. In the bottom margin is the caption, "OLIVER AREY 1864-1867" and handwritten notes, "pg 4-5" and an uppercase "G" and ".55" both enclosed in circles. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph and beneath the image in the bottom margin is noted, "DAVID H. COCHRANE 1856-1864" and handwritten notes ".46 pg 4" and an uppercase "F" enclosed in a circle.
A portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867. Beneath the image of Woolworth is the following information: "SAMUEL B. WOOLWORTH 1852-1856 .60 pg. 5" and there is an uppercase letter "E" enclosed in a circle. Above the image is part of the word "ALBANY." There are also crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the top margin are the handwritten words, "Presidents - Milne."
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. Waterbury supervised the construction of the Willett Street building and wrote the School's first published history. In the bottom margin is the photographer's stamp, "SEMPLE & STEIN" and "ALBANY, N.Y."
A photograph of a painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844 - January 1, 1848.
A picture of "The Normal School Chart of the Elementary Sounds of the English Language," prepared by David Perkins Page, 1847. Page was the founding principal of the State Normal School in Albany, New York.
Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting faculty on during the 1965 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. Duplicate of 1341.
President Joseph Alden; resolution signed by eight female Normal School faculty members praising President Alden for his fair treatment of female faculty; from president's original office records, dated May 23,1882.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. There are crop marks on all four sides of the photograph and beneath the image is an inscription in Milne's hand that reads, "Very sincerely yours William J. Milne." Below the inscription and in the bottom margin is noted ".43 pg. 4-5" and an upper case letter "J" enclosed in a circle.
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A portrait of David Perkins Page, Principal of the New York State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848. In the bottom margin of the photograph is the caption, "DAVID P. PAGE, Principal 1844-1848."
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915-August 23, 1939; John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947; and Milton G. Nelson, Ph.D., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers, from March 1947-July 1949. Each of the three photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A picture of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the background, there are two young girls also posing for the camera.
A picture of John Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947, with Professor Barnard Sawyer Bronson. Along the right margin are the words, "REIMHERR" and "PROFS. SAYLES + BRONSON." The buildings in the background show that the gentlemen are on the downtown campus.
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the lower left corner appears to be a photographer's stamp of "AMERICAN FOTO NEWS."
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE, Principal 1856-1864."
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. "EDWARD P. WATERBURY, President 1882-1889" is noted in the bottom margin of the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844 - January 1, 1848. There are crop marks on all four sides of the photograph.
The sketch used for the creation of the Collins Medal, made in honor of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The sketch was done by National Business Promotions, Inc. and was based on the photographic portrait of Collins taken by Yousuf Karsh.
A portrait of Buell G. Gallagher, a visiting speaker to the campus. He was the President of the City University of New York, City College from 1952 until May 1969. At one time he served as the Assistant Commissioner for Higher Education in the U.S. Office of Education.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. The photograph appears to be encased in matting and in the top margin of the mat are the handwritten words, "Presidents - Milne," and the library stamp ("LIBRARY STATE COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS ALBANY, N.Y.") has been used in the lower part of the image. A photographer's stamp for Sterry of Albany, N.Y. is in the lower margin of the mat.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the bottom margin is the caption, "JOHN M. SAYLES, President 1939-1947."
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B. (viewer's right), Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947 and Milton G. Nelson, Ph.D. (viewer's left), Acting President, New York State College for Teachers from March 1947-July 1949. They are greeting students at a President's Reception.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990 with a group of unidentified people dining. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. O'Leary is the gentleman between the two women on the right side of the table. There are crop marks and in the top margin is written between arrows "55% 14 picas" and an uppercase letter "B" enclosed in a circle.
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867; Joseph Alden, President of the (New York) State Normal School from April 3, 1867-May 23, 1882; Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889; and William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889-September 4, 1914. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867. In the bottom margin is the caption, "SAMUEL B. WOOLWORTH, Principal 1852-1856."
A photograph of a painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848.
A group portrait of members of the New York State Normal School faculty, circa 1850. George R. Perkins (front row, center) was the first faculty member hired in 1844, the year the school was founded, and was principal of the school from 1848 to 1852. Also pictured are: Silas Bowen; Truman H. Bowen; Darwin G. Eaton; Elizabeth Hance; Frederick S. Jewell; William Phelps; and Sumner C. Webb.