A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE, Principal 1856-1864."
A portrait of Joseph Alden, President of the New York State Normal School from April 3, 1867 until May 23, 1882; duplicate of 6125 and 4890. There are crop marks on the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939. At the bottom of the photo are the words, "ABRAM R. BRUBACHER, President (first line) 1915-1939" (second line); duplicate of 2110 and 4916.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A portrait proof of Abram (Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4888, 4916, and 2110. At the top of the photograph is written, "To 6 1/2" with cropping marks and on the right side is written, "To 8" with cropping marks.
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A group of unidentified people participating in a procession during commencement. Pictured leading the procession is Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939. Reproduced from original, which was a gift of Edward Long. Original is in Alumni Memorabilia Collection.
A group of unidentified students and faculty attending an event associated with commencement. The even is taking place at the New York State College for Teachers downtown campus outside of Husted Hall. Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939, is the second gentleman from the viewer's right.
Participating in an event associated with commencement are, left to right: James J. Tigert, U.S. Commissioner of Education; Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; Eliza Kellas, President of Russell Sage; William Henry Metzler, Dean of New York State College for Teachers; and Lawrence H. Van den Berg, President of the New York State Teacher's College at New Paltz. The original is mounted on a piece of matte board, which has a decorative border drawn in pen.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4916, 4888.
Presidents of the New York State College for Teachers and Principles of the State Normal School. Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher is fourth from left in the back row. The photograph was taken on the steps of Page Hall.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 2110 and 4888.
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. Sayles is on the steps of one of the buildings of the downtown campus. In the right margin is written (and crossed out) "NOT USE - REIMHERR - W-Z."
A group portrait taken in Buffalo, N.Y. John Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947, is the second gentleman from the right in the back row. The other men are listed front row, left to right: President Gregory, Dr. Cooper, President DeGroat, President Rockwell, President Hunt (President of airplane factory in Buffalo); and back row, left to right: President Van Denburgh, President Hartwell, Mr. Mooney (Education Department), President Swetman, President Ward, President Sayles, and President Welles. Unless otherwise noted, these men are associated with other New York State colleges.
A picture of the members of the Adirondack Branch of the New York State College for Teachers Alumni Association at a dinner meeting held in the fall of 1950. Pictured are (left to right): Edward A. Reynolds, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1938; Ruth Bush; Fannie Pawel Englander, New York State Normal College, Class of 1910; and Elizabeth Hutchins. With them is Evan R. Collins (standing), President of the institution from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Evan R. Collins, President of the New York State College for Teachers (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from April 30, 1914-September 1, 1959) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 in conversation with a woman.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, during the Torch Night candlelight ceremony.
A picture of an unidentified gentleman speaking at the State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony, 1964. On the podium are Evan R. Collins (viewer's left), President of the university from July 1949-June 30, 1969, the President of Johns Hopkins University, Father Starks (RC Chaplin?), and Harry Lee of the College Council.
A picture of a gathering of the Alumni Association Board of Directors. This photograph appeared in the Alumni Quarterly, summer 1964. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 is the last gentleman on the viewer's right.
A picture of C. Luther Andrews (viewer's left) and Ralph A. Beaver (viewer's right), Head Marshalls leading the graduation procession out of Draper Hall and flanked by students on either side. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949 until June 30, 1969 is immediately behind Beaver.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 delivering a speech during the commencement ceremony, 1964.
A picture of an unidentified student accepting his diploma during the 1964 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. He is shaking hands with Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 speaking at Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of Evan R. Collins (viewer's far left), President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, receiving visitors at the President's Reception associated with Alumni Day, 1964. There are crop marks on two sides of the photograph.
A picture of John B. Laing, Jr., New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1954 with Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. Laing was Chairperson for the State University of New York at Albany Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of (viewer's left to right) Randolph Gardner, Evan R. Collins, an unidentified gentleman, and Louis Wolner, Sr. Collins was President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The event is taking place in association with the 1964 commencement.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, posing in front of the small fountain just outside the Campus Center of the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, seated.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, at the Golden Eye Coffee House -- once located in a Presbyterian Church on Madison Avenue -- meeting with young adults, perhaps students. Collins is to the left, in full profile without glasses.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, with faculty members Edith O. Wallace, Carolyn H. Howard, and Ellen C. Stokes at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1965.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, speaking to an unidentified woman.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, posing in front of the small fountain just outside the Campus Center of the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, at the Golden Eye Coffee House -- once located in a Presbyterian Church on Madison Avenue -- meeting with young adults, perhaps students. Collins is somewhat center in the photograph.
A picture of the procession of students at the State University of New York at Albany's Torch Night, 1965. The event is taking place on the downtown campus. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from August 1962 from July 1949-June 30, 1969, is the gentleman standing beside the column in academic costume.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, making a speech.
An unidentified student accepting her diploma during the 1965 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969, stands at the viewer's right. Female student reciving diploma, Evan Collins seen at right of podium An unidentified student receiving a diploma during commmencement.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting an unidentified student with a diploma during the 1965 State University of New York commencement ceremony.
A picture of the procession of students at the State University of New York at Albany's Torch Night, 1965. The event is taking place on the downtown campus. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from August 1962 from July 1949-June 30, 1969, is the gentleman standing beside the column in academic costume.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting an unidentified student with a diploma during the 1965 State University of New York commencement ceremony.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. He is with Janet R. Grodon (on the viewer's left, shaking hands with Collins) and Mrs. Lyle J. Howland in the center.
A picture of State University of New York at Albany faculty members Edith O. Wallace, Carolyn H. Howard, and Ellen C. Stokes. They are pictured with Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The event is taking place in association with Alumni Day, 1965.
At an event associated with commencement, an unidentified speaker announcing Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949 until June 30, 1969. Collins' back is to the camera.