A picture of Louis J. Wolner, Jr., State University of New York College of Education at Albany, Class of 1961 and 1962, standing next to a portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the New York State Normal School from September 20, 1852 until February 1, 1856.
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE 1856-1864."
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) David Perkins Page, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848; George R. Perkins, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852; Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867; and David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service. Perkins' image is rendered in a sculpted bust in the classical tradition.
A picture of a page from the Daily Graphic, January 27, 1885, pg.630. A collage of sketches, one depicts President-elect Cleveland at the closing exercises of the New York State Normal School, and another is a sketch of Edward P. Waterbury, President of New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882 to August 8, 1889. Sketches by R.Sheridan. Original is in flat file.(3 Copies: 1 in Sesquicentennial Binder and 2 in Photofile)
William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the bottom margin are the words, "WILLIAM J. MILNE, President (first line) 1889-1915" (second line). There are crop marks on all sides and a note of "C 41%" written at the bottom.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the bottom margin is the caption, "WILLIAM J. MILNE, President 1889-1915."
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph, some illegible writing in the top margin, and in the bottom margin is noted, "1-1 5A pg 5 58423."
A portrait of David Perkins Page, Principal of the New York State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848. In the top margin are the words, "served as institute conductors, and as teachers in academies and city schools. The intent of the legislature in establishing this first normal school seems to have" and in the bottom margin, "DAVID P. PAGE FIRST PRINCIPAL OF THE NORMAL SCHOOL AT ALBANY." The incomplete sentence may be part of running text to and from other pages.
A photograph of a portrait bust of George R. Perkins, Principal of the New York State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852. In the bottom margin is the caption, "GEORGE R. PERKINS." In handwritten notes are ".50 D pg 4-5."
A photograph of a portrait bust of George R. Perkins, Principal of the New York State Normal School from January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852. In the bottom margin is the caption, "GEORGE R. PERKINS, Principal January 1, 1848-July 8, 1852."
A contact sheet of images of roughly the same content that being Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990, with an unidentified gentleman. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. Photograph 12431 is one of the images in this contact sheet.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. The Albany Art Union photographer's stamp is located in the bottom margin of the photograph.
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. The caption "EDWARD P. WATERBURY 1882-1889" is noted in the bottom margin of the photograph as are the handwritten notations ".55 pg 4" and an upper case "I" inclosed in a circle. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867. In the bottom margin is the caption, "OLIVER AREY 1864-1867" and handwritten notes, "pg 4-5" and an uppercase "G" and ".55" both enclosed in circles. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. There are crop marks on all sides of the photograph and beneath the image in the bottom margin is noted, "DAVID H. COCHRANE 1856-1864" and handwritten notes ".46 pg 4" and an uppercase "F" enclosed in a circle.
A portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867. Beneath the image of Woolworth is the following information: "SAMUEL B. WOOLWORTH 1852-1856 .60 pg. 5" and there is an uppercase letter "E" enclosed in a circle. Above the image is part of the word "ALBANY." There are also crop marks on all sides of the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the top margin are the handwritten words, "Presidents - Milne."
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. Waterbury supervised the construction of the Willett Street building and wrote the School's first published history. In the bottom margin is the photographer's stamp, "SEMPLE & STEIN" and "ALBANY, N.Y."
A photograph of a painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844 - January 1, 1848.
A picture of "The Normal School Chart of the Elementary Sounds of the English Language," prepared by David Perkins Page, 1847. Page was the founding principal of the State Normal School in Albany, New York.
Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting faculty on during the 1965 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. Duplicate of 1341.
President Joseph Alden; resolution signed by eight female Normal School faculty members praising President Alden for his fair treatment of female faculty; from president's original office records, dated May 23,1882.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. There are crop marks on all four sides of the photograph and beneath the image is an inscription in Milne's hand that reads, "Very sincerely yours William J. Milne." Below the inscription and in the bottom margin is noted ".43 pg. 4-5" and an upper case letter "J" enclosed in a circle.
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A portrait of David Perkins Page, Principal of the New York State Normal School from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848. In the bottom margin of the photograph is the caption, "DAVID P. PAGE, Principal 1844-1848."
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915-August 23, 1939; John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947; and Milton G. Nelson, Ph.D., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers, from March 1947-July 1949. Each of the three photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A picture of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. In the background, there are two young girls also posing for the camera.
A picture of John Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947, with Professor Barnard Sawyer Bronson. Along the right margin are the words, "REIMHERR" and "PROFS. SAYLES + BRONSON." The buildings in the background show that the gentlemen are on the downtown campus.
A picture of John M. Sayles at his desk. Sayles was Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the lower left corner appears to be a photographer's stamp of "AMERICAN FOTO NEWS."
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE, Principal 1856-1864."
A portrait of Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the New York State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889. "EDWARD P. WATERBURY, President 1882-1889" is noted in the bottom margin of the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844 - January 1, 1848. There are crop marks on all four sides of the photograph.
The sketch used for the creation of the Collins Medal, made in honor of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The sketch was done by National Business Promotions, Inc. and was based on the photographic portrait of Collins taken by Yousuf Karsh.
A portrait of Buell G. Gallagher, a visiting speaker to the campus. He was the President of the City University of New York, City College from 1952 until May 1969. At one time he served as the Assistant Commissioner for Higher Education in the U.S. Office of Education.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914. The photograph appears to be encased in matting and in the top margin of the mat are the handwritten words, "Presidents - Milne," and the library stamp ("LIBRARY STATE COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS ALBANY, N.Y.") has been used in the lower part of the image. A photographer's stamp for Sterry of Albany, N.Y. is in the lower margin of the mat.
A portrait of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. In the bottom margin is the caption, "JOHN M. SAYLES, President 1939-1947."
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B. (viewer's right), Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947 and Milton G. Nelson, Ph.D. (viewer's left), Acting President, New York State College for Teachers from March 1947-July 1949. They are greeting students at a President's Reception.
A picture of Vincent O'Leary, Acting President from 1977?1978 and President from 1978?July 31, 1990 with a group of unidentified people dining. During O'Leary's administrations, the institution was named State University of New York at Albany from August 1962?fall 1986 and the University at Albany, SUNY starting in the fall of 1986 and continuing. O'Leary is the gentleman between the two women on the right side of the table. There are crop marks and in the top margin is written between arrows "55% 14 picas" and an uppercase letter "B" enclosed in a circle.
A collection of portraits featuring (left to right, top to bottom) Oliver Arey, Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from December 2, 1864-January 8, 1867; Joseph Alden, President of the (New York) State Normal School from April 3, 1867-May 23, 1882; Edward P. Waterbury, A.M., Ph.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School from June 22, 1882-August 8, 1889; and William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (and then the New York State Normal College) from October 29, 1889-September 4, 1914. Each of the four photographs have the following descriptive information in the bottom margin(s): the gentleman's name, his title, and his dates of service.
A portrait of Samuel B. Woolworth, LL.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from September 20, 1852-February 1, 1856 and Acting Principal from Febrary 19, 1867-April 3, 1867. In the bottom margin is the caption, "SAMUEL B. WOOLWORTH, Principal 1852-1856."
A photograph of a painted portrait of David Perkins Page, founding Prinicipal of the State Normal School, serving from December 13, 1844-January 1, 1848.
A group portrait of members of the New York State Normal School faculty, circa 1850. George R. Perkins (front row, center) was the first faculty member hired in 1844, the year the school was founded, and was principal of the school from 1848 to 1852. Also pictured are: Silas Bowen; Truman H. Bowen; Darwin G. Eaton; Elizabeth Hance; Frederick S. Jewell; William Phelps; and Sumner C. Webb.
A portrait of David H. Cochrane, A.M., Ph.D., Principal of the (New York) State Normal School from February 25, 1856-December [2?], 1864. In the bottom margin is the caption, "DAVID H. COCHRANE, Principal 1856-1864."
A portrait of Joseph Alden, President of the New York State Normal School from April 3, 1867 until May 23, 1882; duplicate of 6125 and 4890. There are crop marks on the photograph.
A portrait of William J. Milne, M.S., Ph.D., LL.D., President of the (New York) State Normal School (then renamed the New York State Normal College and again renamed New York State College for Teachers) from October 29, 1889 - September 4, 1914.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939. At the bottom of the photo are the words, "ABRAM R. BRUBACHER, President (first line) 1915-1939" (second line); duplicate of 2110 and 4916.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939.
A portrait proof of Abram (Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4888, 4916, and 2110. At the top of the photograph is written, "To 6 1/2" with cropping marks and on the right side is written, "To 8" with cropping marks.
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947.
A group of unidentified people participating in a procession during commencement. Pictured leading the procession is Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939. Reproduced from original, which was a gift of Edward Long. Original is in Alumni Memorabilia Collection.
A group of unidentified students and faculty attending an event associated with commencement. The even is taking place at the New York State College for Teachers downtown campus outside of Husted Hall. Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939, is the second gentleman from the viewer's right.
Participating in an event associated with commencement are, left to right: James J. Tigert, U.S. Commissioner of Education; Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; Eliza Kellas, President of Russell Sage; William Henry Metzler, Dean of New York State College for Teachers; and Lawrence H. Van den Berg, President of the New York State Teacher's College at New Paltz. The original is mounted on a piece of matte board, which has a decorative border drawn in pen.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 4916, 4888.
Presidents of the New York State College for Teachers and Principles of the State Normal School. Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher is fourth from left in the back row. The photograph was taken on the steps of Page Hall.
A portrait of Abram (also Abraham) Roy (also Royer) Brubacher, President of the New York State College for Teachers from February 1, 1915 until August 23, 1939; duplicate of 2110 and 4888.
A picture of John M. Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947. Sayles is on the steps of one of the buildings of the downtown campus. In the right margin is written (and crossed out) "NOT USE - REIMHERR - W-Z."
A group portrait taken in Buffalo, N.Y. John Sayles, Pd.B., Acting President of the New York State College for Teachers from 1939-March 1, 1943 and President from March 1, 1943-March 10, 1947, is the second gentleman from the right in the back row. The other men are listed front row, left to right: President Gregory, Dr. Cooper, President DeGroat, President Rockwell, President Hunt (President of airplane factory in Buffalo); and back row, left to right: President Van Denburgh, President Hartwell, Mr. Mooney (Education Department), President Swetman, President Ward, President Sayles, and President Welles. Unless otherwise noted, these men are associated with other New York State colleges.
A picture of the members of the Adirondack Branch of the New York State College for Teachers Alumni Association at a dinner meeting held in the fall of 1950. Pictured are (left to right): Edward A. Reynolds, New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1938; Ruth Bush; Fannie Pawel Englander, New York State Normal College, Class of 1910; and Elizabeth Hutchins. With them is Evan R. Collins (standing), President of the institution from July 1949-June 30, 1969.
Evan R. Collins, President of the New York State College for Teachers (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from April 30, 1914-September 1, 1959) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 in conversation with a woman.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, during the Torch Night candlelight ceremony.
A picture of an unidentified gentleman speaking at the State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony, 1964. On the podium are Evan R. Collins (viewer's left), President of the university from July 1949-June 30, 1969, the President of Johns Hopkins University, Father Starks (RC Chaplin?), and Harry Lee of the College Council.
A picture of a gathering of the Alumni Association Board of Directors. This photograph appeared in the Alumni Quarterly, summer 1964. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 is the last gentleman on the viewer's right.
A picture of C. Luther Andrews (viewer's left) and Ralph A. Beaver (viewer's right), Head Marshalls leading the graduation procession out of Draper Hall and flanked by students on either side. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949 until June 30, 1969 is immediately behind Beaver.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 delivering a speech during the commencement ceremony, 1964.
A picture of an unidentified student accepting his diploma during the 1964 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. He is shaking hands with Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969 speaking at Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of Evan R. Collins (viewer's far left), President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, receiving visitors at the President's Reception associated with Alumni Day, 1964. There are crop marks on two sides of the photograph.
A picture of John B. Laing, Jr., New York State College for Teachers, Class of 1954 with Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. Laing was Chairperson for the State University of New York at Albany Alumni Day, 1964.
A picture of (viewer's left to right) Randolph Gardner, Evan R. Collins, an unidentified gentleman, and Louis Wolner, Sr. Collins was President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The event is taking place in association with the 1964 commencement.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, posing in front of the small fountain just outside the Campus Center of the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, seated.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, at the Golden Eye Coffee House -- once located in a Presbyterian Church on Madison Avenue -- meeting with young adults, perhaps students. Collins is to the left, in full profile without glasses.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, with faculty members Edith O. Wallace, Carolyn H. Howard, and Ellen C. Stokes at an event associated with Alumni Day, 1965.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, speaking to an unidentified woman.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, posing in front of the small fountain just outside the Campus Center of the uptown campus.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, at the Golden Eye Coffee House -- once located in a Presbyterian Church on Madison Avenue -- meeting with young adults, perhaps students. Collins is somewhat center in the photograph.
A picture of the procession of students at the State University of New York at Albany's Torch Night, 1965. The event is taking place on the downtown campus. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from August 1962 from July 1949-June 30, 1969, is the gentleman standing beside the column in academic costume.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969, making a speech.
An unidentified student accepting her diploma during the 1965 State University of New York at Albany commencement ceremony. Evan R. Collins, President of the university from June 1949-June 30, 1969, stands at the viewer's right. Female student reciving diploma, Evan Collins seen at right of podium An unidentified student receiving a diploma during commmencement.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting an unidentified student with a diploma during the 1965 State University of New York commencement ceremony.
A picture of the procession of students at the State University of New York at Albany's Torch Night, 1965. The event is taking place on the downtown campus. Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from August 1962 from July 1949-June 30, 1969, is the gentleman standing beside the column in academic costume.
A picture of Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany from July 1949-June 30, 1969, presenting an unidentified student with a diploma during the 1965 State University of New York commencement ceremony.
Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the university at the time of this photograph and was so from August 1962 until the fall of 1986) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. He is with Janet R. Grodon (on the viewer's left, shaking hands with Collins) and Mrs. Lyle J. Howland in the center.
A picture of State University of New York at Albany faculty members Edith O. Wallace, Carolyn H. Howard, and Ellen C. Stokes. They are pictured with Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949-June 30, 1969. The event is taking place in association with Alumni Day, 1965.
At an event associated with commencement, an unidentified speaker announcing Evan R. Collins, President of the State University of New York at Albany (the name of the institution at the time of this event) from July 1949 until June 30, 1969. Collins' back is to the camera.